NH SB98 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-11 - Law Without Signature 06/09/15; Eff. Date 08/08/15, Chapter 0126; Art 44, Pt II, NH Constitution
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-11 - Law Without Signature 06/09/15; Eff. Date 08/08/15, Chapter 0126; Art 44, Pt II, NH Constitution
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to third party review required by the planning board.
Title
Relative to third party review required by the planning board.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-11 | Senate | Law Without Signature 06/09/15; Eff. Date 08/08/15, Chapter 0126; Art 44, Pt II, NH Constitution |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 5/7/2015); Senate Journal 14 |
2015-05-06 | House | Enrolled; House Journal 41, PG. 1779 |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Sen. Birdsell Concurs with House Amendment #1113h, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 12 |
2015-04-15 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #1113h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 34, PG. 1547-1548 |
2015-04-15 | House | Amendment #1113h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 34, PG. 1547-1548 |
2015-04-08 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-1113h for Apr 15 (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 29, PG. 1306 |
2015-03-17 | House | Executive Session: 3/26/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2015-03-17 | House | Public Hearing: 3/24/2015 11:20 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2015-03-04 | House | Introduced and Referred to Municipal and County Government; House Journal 22, PG. 629 |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0201s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 5 |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0201s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0201s, 2/12/15; Senate Calendar 9 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Hearing:=== TIME CHANGE === 1/28/15, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 1:15 p.m.; Senate Calendar 7 |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 4 |