NJ A1063 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A5563
Note: Carry Over of previous S3967
Note: Carry Over of previous S3967
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-15 - Approved P.L.2021, c.36.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-15 - Approved P.L.2021, c.36.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Enhances homeowner notification of foreclosure mediation program requirements.
Title
Enhances homeowner notification of foreclosure mediation program requirements.
Sponsors
Rep. Mila Jasey [D] | Rep. Carol Murphy [D] | Sen. Joseph Cryan [D] | Sen. Troy Singleton [D] |
Rep. Nancy Pinkin [D] | Rep. Pedro Mejia [D] | Rep. Cleopatra Tucker [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2961 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-08 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-08 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-15 | Senate | Approved P.L.2021, c.36. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (32-0) |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Substituted for S2961 |
2020-10-08 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-06-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
2020-06-29 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (71-0-2) |
2020-06-15 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5563 (Carry Over) 2020-01-13 - Passed by the Assembly (75-0-0)
S2961 (Same As) 2021-01-28 - Substituted by A1063
S3967 (Carry Over) 2019-06-20 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
S2961 (Same As) 2021-01-28 - Substituted by A1063
S3967 (Carry Over) 2019-06-20 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee