NJ A1083 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies failure to provide minimum care to an animal constitutes animal cruelty.
Title
Clarifies failure to provide minimum care to an animal constitutes animal cruelty.
Sponsors
Rep. Nelson Albano [D] | Sen. John Burzichelli [D] | Rep. Reed Gusciora [D] | Rep. Pamela Lampitt [D] |
Rep. Matthew Milam [D] | Rep. Concetta Wagner [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-14 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2011-03-21 | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee | |
2011-03-14 | Passed by the Assembly (78-0-0) | |
2011-01-24 | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading | |
2010-01-12 | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1182 (Same As) 2011-12-01 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading