NJ A1098 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on January 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-11 - Approved P.L.2015, c.197.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on January 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-11 - Approved P.L.2015, c.197.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DHS and DMVA to conduct or contract for follow-up studies of former residents transitioning to community from their facilities.*
Title
Requires DHS and DMVA to conduct or contract for follow-up studies of former residents transitioning to community from their facilities.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-12-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S671 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-11 | Senate | Approved P.L.2015, c.197. |
2015-12-07 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (36-0) |
2015-12-07 | Senate | Substituted for S671 (1R) |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-06-23 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2014-06-16 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
2014-03-20 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (75-0-0) |
2014-02-24 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-01-16 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S671 (Same As) 2015-12-07 - Substituted by A1098 (1R)