NJ A1135 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A4013

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 24 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-10-22 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Reinstates prior property tax exemption for nonprofit hospitals with on-site for-profit medical providers; requires some of these hospitals to pay community service contributions; establishes Nonprofit Hospital Community Service Contribution Study Commission; prohibits certain third-party property tax appeals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reinstates prior property tax exemption for nonprofit hospitals with on-site for-profit medical providers; requires some of these hospitals to pay community service contributions; establishes Nonprofit Hospital Community Service Contribution Study Commission; prohibits certain third-party property tax appeals.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-10-22 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-17 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-22SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2020-10-08SenateTransferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2020-10-08SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
2020-09-24AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (68-10-1)
2020-09-17AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2020-09-14AssemblyTransferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2020-01-14AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4013 (Carry Over) 2018-05-17 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S357 (Same As) 2020-10-22 - Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback