NJ A1215 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1190
Note: Carry Foward to future A5240
Note: Carry Over of previous A1515
Note: Carry Foward to future A5240
Note: Carry Over of previous A1515
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Limits forum of consumer contract disputes to New Jersey.
Title
Limits forum of consumer contract disputes to New Jersey.
Sponsors
Sen. John McKeon [D] | Rep. Daniel Benson [D] | Rep. Elizabeth Maher Muoio [D] | Rep. Nancy Pinkin [D] |
Sen. Paul Moriarty [D] | Rep. Patricia Jones [D] | Rep. Craig Coughlin [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1215 (Carry Over) 2019-03-07 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A1215 (Carry Over) 2019-03-07 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A1515 (Carry Over) 2017-01-30 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S327 (Same As) 2019-06-17 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A1215 (Carry Over) 2019-03-07 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A1515 (Carry Over) 2017-01-30 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S327 (Same As) 2019-06-17 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee