NJ A1428 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A5024

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-7)
Status: Passed on July 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-19 - Approved P.L.2019, c.189.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Requires Department of Education to develop guidelines for school districts concerning child trafficking awareness and prevention.**

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires Department of Education to develop guidelines for school districts concerning child trafficking awareness and prevention.**

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2653 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-18 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-19AssemblyApproved P.L.2019, c.189.
2019-05-23AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (77-0-0)
2019-03-25AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2019-03-25SenatePassed by the Senate (38-0)
2019-03-25SenateSubstituted for S2653 (1R)
2019-03-14SenateSenate Amendment (27-0) (Ruiz)
2019-03-04SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-10-18SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2018-10-18SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-04-05SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
2018-03-26AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (76-0-0)
2018-02-12AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-01-09AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee

Same As/Similar To

A5024 (Carry Over) 2017-06-19 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S2653 (Same As) 2019-03-25 - Substituted by A1428 (2R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback