NJ A1490 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A5367
Note: Carry Over of previous S3544
Note: Carry Over of previous S3544
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - Substituted by S349
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - Substituted by S349
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Concerns motor vehicles overtaking certain pedestrians and persons operating bicycles and personal conveyances.
Title
Concerns motor vehicles overtaking certain pedestrians and persons operating bicycles and personal conveyances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-04 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-18 | Assembly | Substituted by S349 |
2024-03-04 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2024-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5367 (Carry Over) 2023-05-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
S3544 (Carry Over) 2023-12-11 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
S349 (Same As) 2024-03-18 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (68-7-0)
S3544 (Carry Over) 2023-12-11 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
S349 (Same As) 2024-03-18 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (68-7-0)