NJ A1504 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A2451
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Approved P.L.2019, c.59.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Approved P.L.2019, c.59.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
"Medical Aid in Dying for the Terminally Ill Act"; permits qualified terminally ill patient to self-administer medication to end life in humane and dignified manner.*
Title
"Medical Aid in Dying for the Terminally Ill Act"; permits qualified terminally ill patient to self-administer medication to end life in humane and dignified manner.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Table Motion (Y: 46 N: 28 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 33 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S1072 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 16 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 33 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S1072 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 16 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-12 | Senate | Approved P.L.2019, c.59. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (21-16) |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Substituted for S1072 (1R) |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (41-33-4) |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Motion To Table (46-28-0) (Greenwald) |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Motion To Layover (Webber) |
2019-01-31 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2018-03-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-01 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2451 (Carry Over) 2016-11-03 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
S1072 (Same As) 2019-03-25 - Substituted by A1504 (2R)
S1072 (Same As) 2019-03-25 - Substituted by A1504 (2R)