NJ A1545 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-01-13 - Approved P.L.2013, c.182.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-01-13 - Approved P.L.2013, c.182.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Revises law concerning certain professional and occupational licenses.
Title
Revises law concerning certain professional and occupational licenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-12-19 - Assembly - Assembly Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-18 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2116 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-18 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2116 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-13 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2013, c.182. |
2013-12-19 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (80-0-0) |
2013-11-18 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2013-11-18 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2013-11-18 | Senate | Substituted for S2116 (1R) |
2013-09-30 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
2013-03-21 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0) |
2013-02-21 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Riley) |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Burzichelli) |
2012-06-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2012-01-10 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulatory Oversight and Gaming Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2116 (Same As) 2013-11-18 - Substituted by A1545 (4R)