NJ A1604 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A962
Note: Carry Over of previous A5222
Note: Carry Over of previous A5222
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.467.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.467.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
"Recreational Therapists Licensing Act."
Title
"Recreational Therapists Licensing Act."
Sponsors
Rep. Herbert Conaway [D] | Rep. Carol Murphy [D] | Rep. Angelica Jimenez [D] | Sen. Troy Singleton [D] |
Rep. James Kennedy [D] | Sen. Sandra Cunningham [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2734 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 65 N: 8 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-06 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-12 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 7 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-10 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-15 - Assembly - Assembly Regulated Professions Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 65 N: 8 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-06 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-12 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 7 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-10 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-15 - Assembly - Assembly Regulated Professions Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, c.467. |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (65-8-0) |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (31-9) |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Substituted for S2734 (2R) |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-12-12 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2019-12-12 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
2019-01-31 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (68-7-0) |
2018-12-10 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-10-15 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1604 (Carry Over) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.467.
A5222 (Carry Over) 2017-12-04 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee
S2734 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by A1604 (2R)
A5222 (Carry Over) 2017-12-04 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee
S2734 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by A1604 (2R)