NJ A1649 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A3548
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Approved P.L.2017, c.71.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Approved P.L.2017, c.71.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires local governments and authorities to obtain financing cost estimate from NJ Environmental Infrastructure Trust for certain projects.*
Title
Requires local governments and authorities to obtain financing cost estimate from NJ Environmental Infrastructure Trust for certain projects.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 66 N: 4 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S853 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-15 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-03 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 69 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S853 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-15 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-03 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 69 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-11 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2017, c.71. |
2017-02-15 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (66-4-0) |
2017-01-23 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (36-0) |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Substituted for S853 (2R) |
2016-12-15 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-11-03 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2016-11-03 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-06-06 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
2016-05-26 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (69-3-0) |
2016-02-08 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3548 (Carry Over) 2015-03-09 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S853 (Same As) 2017-01-23 - Substituted by A1649 (2R)
S853 (Same As) 2017-01-23 - Substituted by A1649 (2R)