NJ A1950 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-11 - Substituted by S1184 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-11 - Substituted by S1184 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Revises requirements for licensure and creates physician-delegated scope of practice for physician assistants.
Title
Revises requirements for licensure and creates physician-delegated scope of practice for physician assistants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-05 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-11 | Assembly | Substituted by S1184 (2R) |
2015-12-17 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Conaway) |
2015-02-05 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-01-16 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1184 (Same As) 2016-01-19 - Approved P.L.2015, c.224.