NJ A2123 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A2987
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Motion To Table (41-25-0) (Greenwald)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Motion To Table (41-25-0) (Greenwald)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes various changes to interest arbitration procedures; repeals sunset provision.
Title
Makes various changes to interest arbitration procedures; repeals sunset provision.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Table Motion (Y: 52 N: 25 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Assembly | Motion To Table (41-25-0) (Greenwald) |
2018-01-08 | Assembly | Motion To Relieve from ASL (O'Scanlon) |
2017-06-08 | Assembly | Motion To Table (52-25-0) (Greenwald) |
2017-06-08 | Assembly | Motion To Relieve from ASL (O'Scanlon) |
2016-01-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2987 (Carry Over) 2014-03-24 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee