NJ A2126 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1888
Note: Carry Over of previous A5532
Note: Carry Over of previous S3913
Note: Carry Over of previous A5532
Note: Carry Over of previous S3913
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-21 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-21 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs DEP to establish pollinator habitat program for closed landfills.
Title
Directs DEP to establish pollinator habitat program for closed landfills.
Sponsors
Rep. Christopher Tully [D] | Rep. Eric Houghtaling [D] | Rep. Lisa Swain [D] | Sen. Parker Space [R] |
Rep. Joann Downey [D] | Rep. Clinton Calabrese [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2126 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A5532 (Carry Over) 2019-06-10 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S3913 (Carry Over) 2019-06-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
A5532 (Carry Over) 2019-06-10 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S3913 (Carry Over) 2019-06-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee