NJ A221 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A864
Note: Carry Foward to future S3562
Note: Carry Over of previous A1274
Note: Carry Over of previous S2325
Note: Carry Foward to future S3562
Note: Carry Over of previous A1274
Note: Carry Over of previous S2325
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes certain benefits for Class Two special law enforcement officers; allows arson investigators to carry a firearm at all times.
Title
Establishes certain benefits for Class Two special law enforcement officers; allows arson investigators to carry a firearm at all times.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A221 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
A221 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
A1274 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
S2250 (Same As) 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
S2325 (Carry Over) 2018-03-22 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A221 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
A1274 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
S2250 (Same As) 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
S2325 (Carry Over) 2018-03-22 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A221 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A0500/221_I1.HTM |