NJ A2376 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2886
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-18 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (McKeon)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-18 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (McKeon)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes criminal background check and judgement search requirement for name change; prohibits name change in certain circumstances.*
Title
Establishes criminal background check and judgement search requirement for name change; prohibits name change in certain circumstances.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-08 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-18 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (McKeon) |
2016-02-08 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-02-04 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2376 (Carry Over) 2016-02-18 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (McKeon)
S1679 (Same As) 2016-02-29 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
S1679 (Same As) 2016-02-29 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee