NJ A2880 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A3103
Note: Carry Over of previous S380
Note: Carry Over of previous S380
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-14 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-14 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain drones to contain geo-fencing technology; makes violation a fourth degree crime.
Title
Requires certain drones to contain geo-fencing technology; makes violation a fourth degree crime.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-14 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-01 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2880 (Carry Over) 2019-02-14 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S797 (Same As) 2018-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
S380 (Carry Over) 2016-01-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
S797 (Same As) 2018-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
S380 (Carry Over) 2016-01-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee