NJ A2884 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A5469
Note: Carry Over of previous S3970
Note: Carry Over of previous S3970
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Public Safety and Preparedness Committee
Pending: Assembly Public Safety and Preparedness Committee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Public Safety and Preparedness Committee
Pending: Assembly Public Safety and Preparedness Committee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for purchase of PFRS credit for service as class two special law enforcement officer.
Title
Provides for purchase of PFRS credit for service as class two special law enforcement officer.
Sponsors
Rep. Anthony Verrelli [D] | Rep. Robert Karabinchak [D] | Rep. Benjie Wimberly [D] | Rep. Carol Murphy [D] |
Rep. Shanique Speight [D] | Rep. Antwan McClellan [R] | Rep. Erik Simonsen [R] | Rep. Mitchelle Drulis [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-04 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-04 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Public Safety and Preparedness Committee |
2024-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5469 (Carry Over) 2023-12-11 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
S3970 (Carry Over) 2023-06-15 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
S2070 (Same As) 2024-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
S3970 (Carry Over) 2023-06-15 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
S2070 (Same As) 2024-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee