NJ A2972 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S1766
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S1298 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S1298 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits municipalities to provide information on property tax bills concerning amount of local tax dollars saved through shared services.
Title
Permits municipalities to provide information on property tax bills concerning amount of local tax dollars saved through shared services.
Sponsors
Rep. Vincent Mazzeo [D] | Rep. Aura Dunn [R] | Sen. Parker Space [R] | Rep. Harold Wirths [R] |
Rep. Carol Murphy [D] | Rep. Roy Freiman [D] | Rep. Clinton Calabrese [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-12-09 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Substituted by S1298 (1R) |
2019-12-09 | Assembly | Reported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-08 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1298 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.393.
S1766 (Carry Over) 2016-03-07 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
S1766 (Carry Over) 2016-03-07 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee