NJ A3004 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1963
Note: Carry Foward to future S244
Note: Carry Over of previous S4155
Note: Carry Over of previous A5956
Note: Carry Foward to future S244
Note: Carry Over of previous S4155
Note: Carry Over of previous A5956
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-17 - Transferred to Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-17 - Transferred to Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revises eligibility for convicted drug offenders to receive general assistance benefits under Work First New Jersey program.
Title
Revises eligibility for convicted drug offenders to receive general assistance benefits under Work First New Jersey program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-17 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Health Committee |
2020-02-20 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3004 (Carry Over) 2021-05-17 - Transferred to Assembly Health Committee
A3004 (Carry Over) 2021-05-17 - Transferred to Assembly Health Committee
S805 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S4155 (Carry Over) 2019-10-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A5956 (Carry Over) 2019-11-18 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
A3004 (Carry Over) 2021-05-17 - Transferred to Assembly Health Committee
S805 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S4155 (Carry Over) 2019-10-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A5956 (Carry Over) 2019-11-18 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A3004 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A3500/3004_I1.HTM |