NJ A306 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A2187
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-8)
Status: Passed on January 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-08 - Approved P.L.2017, c.258.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-8)
Status: Passed on January 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-08 - Approved P.L.2017, c.258.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
"New Jersey Housing Assistance for Veterans Act," establishes pilot program to assist certain veterans with housing modification and rehabilitation; appropriates $5 million.
Title
"New Jersey Housing Assistance for Veterans Act," establishes pilot program to assist certain veterans with housing modification and rehabilitation; appropriates $5 million.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-12-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2017 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-30 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-04 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-30 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-04 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | Approved P.L.2017, c.258. |
2017-12-18 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-0) |
2017-12-18 | Senate | Substituted for S2017 |
2017-11-30 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-06-12 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2017-06-08 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (75-0-0) |
2016-12-15 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-04-04 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2016-01-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2187 (Carry Over) 2014-01-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
S2017 (Same As) 2017-12-18 - Substituted by A306
S2017 (Same As) 2017-12-18 - Substituted by A306
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2016/A306 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2016/A0500/306_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=A306 |