NJ A3075 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1653
Note: Carry Foward to future S2142
Note: Carry Over of previous S3183
Note: Carry Foward to future S2142
Note: Carry Over of previous S3183
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-07 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Pending: Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-07 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Pending: Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Encourages development of zero-emission vehicle fueling and charging infrastructure in redevelopment projects.*
Title
Encourages development of zero-emission vehicle fueling and charging infrastructure in redevelopment projects.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-13 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-13 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-07 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
2019-01-31 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (75-2-0) |
2018-10-29 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2018-09-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-08 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3075 (Carry Over) 2019-02-07 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
A3075 (Carry Over) 2019-02-07 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
S597 (Same As) 2018-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
S3183 (Carry Over) 2017-05-15 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
A3075 (Carry Over) 2019-02-07 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
S597 (Same As) 2018-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
S3183 (Carry Over) 2017-05-15 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee