NJ A3100 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on July 1 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-15 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on July 1 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-15 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires inmates be provided with medical discharge summary before release.*
Title
Requires inmates be provided with medical discharge summary before release.*
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-15 | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) | |
2011-11-21 | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2010-07-01 | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2282 (Same As) 2011-12-08 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2010/A3100 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2010/A3500/3100_I1.HTM |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2010/A3500/3100_R1.HTM |