NJ A3142 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 25 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-12-01 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on October 25 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-12-01 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs BPU to establish standards concerning local government renewable energy generation demonstration projects utilizing renewable energy technologies. *
Title
Directs BPU to establish standards concerning local government renewable energy generation demonstration projects utilizing renewable energy technologies. *
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-10-25 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee | |
2011-12-01 | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading | |
2010-11-08 | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee | |
2010-10-25 | Passed by the Assembly (52-25-0) | |
2010-09-13 | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading | |
2010-07-02 | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2196 (Same As) 2011-12-01 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee