NJ A315 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1487
Note: Carry Foward to future A3524
Note: Carry Over of previous A3806
Note: Carry Foward to future A3524
Note: Carry Over of previous A3806
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-07 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-07 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes four-year pilot program in Ocean County for electronic monitoring of certain domestic violence offenders; designated as "Lisa's Law"; appropriates $2.5 million.
Title
Establishes four-year pilot program in Ocean County for electronic monitoring of certain domestic violence offenders; designated as "Lisa's Law"; appropriates $2.5 million.
Sponsors
Sen. Troy Singleton [D] | Rep. Ronald Dancer [R] | Rep. Gabriela Mosquera [D] | Rep. Daniel Benson [D] |
Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] | Rep. Sean Kean [R] | Rep. Elizabeth Maher Muoio [D] | Rep. David Wolfe [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-10-06 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-07 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2016-10-06 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2016-01-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A315 (Carry Over) 2017-12-07 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
A315 (Carry Over) 2017-12-07 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
A3806 (Carry Over) 2016-01-19 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
S2679 (Same As) 2016-10-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A315 (Carry Over) 2017-12-07 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
A3806 (Carry Over) 2016-01-19 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
S2679 (Same As) 2016-10-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee