NJ A3293 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-11 - Approved P.L.2015, c.205.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-11 - Approved P.L.2015, c.205.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows military personnel and veterans to present certain identifying documents in lieu of municipal beach tags to gain admission to certain beaches.
Title
Allows military personnel and veterans to present certain identifying documents in lieu of municipal beach tags to gain admission to certain beaches.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-12-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2146 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-11 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-11 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-11 | Senate | Approved P.L.2015, c.205. |
2015-12-07 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (36-0) |
2015-12-07 | Senate | Substituted for S2146 |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2015-05-14 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (72-0-0) |
2014-12-11 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-06-05 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2146 (Same As) 2015-12-07 - Substituted by A3293