NJ A3294 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S983
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-30 - Substituted by S866 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-30 - Substituted by S866 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends eligibility for certain individuals for emergency assistance.
Title
Extends eligibility for certain individuals for emergency assistance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-30 | Assembly | Substituted by S866 (1R) |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Budget Committee |
2018-02-12 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S866 (Same As) 2018-12-20 - Approved P.L.2018, c.164.
S983 (Carry Over) 2016-05-02 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate
S983 (Carry Over) 2016-05-02 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate