NJ S866 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S983
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-20 - Approved P.L.2018, c.164.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-20 - Approved P.L.2018, c.164.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Extends eligibility for certain individuals for emergency assistance.
Title
Extends eligibility for certain individuals for emergency assistance.
Sponsors
Sen. Stephen Sweeney [D] | Sen. Joseph Vitale [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] | Sen. Raj Mukherji [D] |
Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] | Sen. Nilsa Cruz-Perez [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 65 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Adopt Governor Recommendations (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 12 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3294 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Adopt Governor Recommendations (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 12 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3294 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-20 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2018, c.164. |
2018-12-17 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (65-11-0) |
2018-10-29 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly on Concurrence with Gov. Recommend. |
2018-10-29 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-1) |
2018-09-27 | Senate | 2nd Reading in the Senate on Concur. w/Governor's Recommend. (37-0) |
2018-08-27 | Senate | Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate |
2018-06-30 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (60-12-0) |
2018-06-30 | Assembly | Substituted for A3294 (1R) |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Budget Committee |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-0) |
2018-06-04 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S983 (Carry Over) 2016-05-02 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate
A3294 (Same As) 2018-06-30 - Substituted by S866 (1R)
A3294 (Same As) 2018-06-30 - Substituted by S866 (1R)