NJ A3467 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S1458
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-12 - Substituted by S699 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-12 - Substituted by S699 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows certain students including undocumented immigrants who meet certain criteria to qualify for State student financial aid programs.
Title
Allows certain students including undocumented immigrants who meet certain criteria to qualify for State student financial aid programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | Assembly | Substituted by S699 (1R) |
2018-04-12 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Schaer) |
2018-03-05 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-03-05 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S699 (Same As) 2018-05-09 - Approved P.L.2018, c.12.
S1458 (Carry Over) 2016-02-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
S1458 (Carry Over) 2016-02-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee