NJ A3613 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 13 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-29 - Substituted by S2144 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 13 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-29 - Substituted by S2144 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals and replaces Chapters 1 and 7 of the Uniform Commercial Code and revises various additional provisions of the code.
Title
Repeals and replaces Chapters 1 and 7 of the Uniform Commercial Code and revises various additional provisions of the code.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Schaer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-29 | Assembly | Substituted by S2144 (3R) |
2013-02-07 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2012-12-13 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2144 (Same As) 2013-06-13 - Approved P.L.2013, c.65.
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2012/A3613 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2012/A4000/3613_I1.HTM |