NJ A3668 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-12-01 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-12-01 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes certain municipalities and rural electric cooperatives to establish a municipal shared services energy authority.*
Title
Authorizes certain municipalities and rural electric cooperatives to establish a municipal shared services energy authority.*
Sponsors
Rep. Upendra Chivukula [D] | Sen. Patrick Diegnan [D] | Sen. James Holzapfel [R] | Rep. Joseph Malone [R] |
Sen. John McKeon [D] | Rep. John Wisniewski [D] | Rep. David Wolfe [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-14 - Assembly - Assembly Table Motion (Y: 47 N: 30 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee | |
2011-12-01 | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading | |
2011-03-21 | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee | |
2011-03-14 | Passed by the Assembly (76-0-2) | |
2011-03-14 | Motion To Table (Cryan) (47-30-0) | |
2011-03-14 | Motion To Aa (Thompson) | |
2011-02-03 | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading | |
2011-01-06 | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2630 (Same As) 2011-12-01 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee