NJ A3712 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2929
Note: Carry Foward to future S1034
Note: Carry Foward to future S1034
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-06-01 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-06-01 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requires disclosure of lead drinking water hazards to tenants of residential units; prohibits landlords from obstructing replacement of lead service lines; concerns testing of residential units for lead drinking water hazards.
Title
Requires disclosure of lead drinking water hazards to tenants of residential units; prohibits landlords from obstructing replacement of lead service lines; concerns testing of residential units for lead drinking water hazards.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Schaer [D] | Rep. Louis Greenwald [D] | Rep. Daniel Benson [D] | Rep. Herbert Conaway [D] |
Rep. Yvonne Lopez [D] | Rep. William Moen [D] | Rep. Ellen Park [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-12-05 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Not Reported (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-12-05 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Not Reported (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-01 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2023-05-25 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (74-0-0) |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-05-02 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3712 (Carry Over) 2023-06-01 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A3712 (Carry Over) 2023-06-01 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S2695 (Same As) 2023-03-02 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A3712 (Carry Over) 2023-06-01 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S2695 (Same As) 2023-03-02 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee