NJ A3717 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on August 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-08 - Approved P.L.2013, c.115.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on August 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-08 - Approved P.L.2013, c.115.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires submission of certain mental health records to National Instant Criminal Background Check System.
Title
Requires submission of certain mental health records to National Instant Criminal Background Check System.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-30 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Amend (Y: 68 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2492 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Amend (Y: 68 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2492 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-08 | Senate | Approved P.L.2013, c.115. |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0) |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2013-05-20 | Assembly | Concur by Assembly Amendments (68-10-0) (Lampitt) |
2013-05-13 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-0) |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Substituted for S2492 (SCS) |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
2013-02-21 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (71-5-1) |
2013-02-14 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2013-01-28 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2492 (Same As) 2013-05-13 - Substituted by A3717 (1R)