NJ A3766 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-13 - Substituted by S2448 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-13 - Substituted by S2448 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
"Higher Education Epinephrine Emergency Treatment Act."
Title
"Higher Education Epinephrine Emergency Treatment Act."
Sponsors
Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D] | Rep. Nancy Munoz [R] | Rep. BettyLou DeCroce [R] | Rep. Celeste Riley [D] |
Rep. Daniel Benson [D] | Sen. Patrick Diegnan [D] | Rep. Thomas Giblin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-13 | Assembly | Substituted by S2448 (1R) |
2013-11-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2013-02-07 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2448 (Same As) 2014-01-17 - Approved P.L.2013, c.211.
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2012/A3766 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2012/A4000/3766_I1.HTM |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2012/A4000/3766_R1.HTM |