NJ A3894 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S4208
Note: Carry Over of previous A5822
Note: Carry Over of previous A5822
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
Pending: Assembly Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
Pending: Assembly Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends certain fire safety statutes to update licensure and equipment requirements and liability, fee, and penalty provisions.
Title
Amends certain fire safety statutes to update licensure and equipment requirements and liability, fee, and penalty provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2580 (Same As) 2024-02-08 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
S4208 (Carry Over) 2023-12-07 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A5822 (Carry Over) 2023-12-04 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
S4208 (Carry Over) 2023-12-07 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A5822 (Carry Over) 2023-12-04 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/A3894 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/A4000/3894_I1.HTM |