NJ A3950 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A667
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on January 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.449.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on January 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.449.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits employer use of tracking device in vehicle operated by employee under certain circumstances.
Title
Prohibits employer use of tracking device in vehicle operated by employee under certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 51 N: 25 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 49 N: 26 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3180 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 25 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-12 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-22 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 51 N: 25 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 49 N: 26 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3180 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 25 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-12 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-22 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-18 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2021, c.449. |
2022-01-10 | Assembly | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (30-3) |
2022-01-10 | Assembly | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading - Concur. w/Gov's Recom. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Passed by the Assembly (51-25-0) |
2022-01-10 | Senate | 2nd Reading in the Assembly on Concur. w/Gov.'s Recommend. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | First Reading/Governor Recommendations Only |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Conditional Veto, Received in the Assembly |
2021-12-20 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (49-26-0) |
2021-11-08 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (24-13) |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Substituted for S3180 (1R) |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
2020-11-19 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee |
2020-11-16 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (47-25-2) |
2020-11-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-10-22 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-04-13 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3950 (Carry Over) 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.449.
S3180 (Same As) 2021-06-30 - Substituted by A3950 (3R)
S3180 (Same As) 2021-06-30 - Substituted by A3950 (3R)