NJ A3968 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Restricts health insurers from limiting access to pain medication.
Title
Restricts health insurers from limiting access to pain medication.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2011-07-08 | Reviewed by the Pension and Health Benefits Commission Recommend to not enact | |
2011-05-19 | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee | |
2011-05-09 | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2010/A3968 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2010/A4000/3968_I1.HTM |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2010/A4000/3968_R1.HTM |