NJ A4069 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A299
Note: Carry Over of previous S2783
Note: Carry Over of previous S2783
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Public Safety and Preparedness Committee
Pending: Assembly Public Safety and Preparedness Committee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Public Safety and Preparedness Committee
Pending: Assembly Public Safety and Preparedness Committee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires State Police to maintain 24-hour hotline for receiving anonymous tips regarding potential threats to school safety and security.
Title
Requires State Police to maintain 24-hour hotline for receiving anonymous tips regarding potential threats to school safety and security.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Public Safety and Preparedness Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A299 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee
S2783 (Carry Over) 2022-06-02 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
S3013 (Same As) 2024-04-08 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
S2783 (Carry Over) 2022-06-02 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
S3013 (Same As) 2024-04-08 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/A4069 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/A4500/4069_I1.HTM |