NJ A4134 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-30 - Approved P.L.2020, c.116.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Concerns workers' compensation; revises effective date of P.L.2019, c.387 to clarify that law applies to cases pending, but not yet settled, or filed on or after date of enactment; increases burial expense allowance.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerns workers' compensation; revises effective date of P.L.2019, c.387 to clarify that law applies to cases pending, but not yet settled, or filed on or after date of enactment; increases burial expense allowance.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-09-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2722 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-22 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-10 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-30SenateApproved P.L.2020, c.116.
2020-09-24SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (36-0)
2020-09-24SenateSubstituted for S2722 (1R)
2020-09-21SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2020-09-17SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2020-08-27AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (70-5-3)
2020-08-24AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2020-08-10AssemblyReported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2020-05-11AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2722 (Same As) 2020-09-24 - Substituted by A4134 (1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback