NJ A4276 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Passed on August 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-28 - Approved P.L.2020, c.70.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Passed on August 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-28 - Approved P.L.2020, c.70.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes "The Ballot Cure Act" to modify and establish various voting procedures.
Title
Establishes "The Ballot Cure Act" to modify and establish various voting procedures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2598 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-13 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-13 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-28 | Senate | Approved P.L.2020, c.70. |
2020-08-27 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (31-7) |
2020-08-27 | Senate | Substituted for S2598/2699 (SCS/1R) |
2020-08-27 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2020-08-27 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (51-27-0) |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-08-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-06-15 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2598 (Same As) 2020-08-27 - Substituted by A4276 (2R)
S2699 (Same As) 2020-08-20 - Combined with S2598 (SCS)
S2699 (Same As) 2020-08-20 - Combined with S2598 (SCS)