NJ A4616 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1850
Note: Carry Foward to future S2606
Note: Carry Foward to future S2606
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Enrolled on January 11 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-19 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on January 11 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-19 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends by two months seasonal retail consumption alcoholic beverage license.
Title
Extends by two months seasonal retail consumption alcoholic beverage license.
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Giblin [D] | Rep. Wayne DeAngelo [D] | Sen. Raj Mukherji [D] | Sen. Stephen Sweeney [D] |
Rep. Joseph Egan [D] | Sen. Patrick Diegnan [D] | Rep. Linda Stender [D] | Rep. Craig Coughlin [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-01-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2958 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 18 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-10 - Assembly - Assembly Regulatory Oversight Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 18 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-10 - Assembly - Assembly Regulatory Oversight Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-19 | Senate | Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (30-8) |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Substituted for S2958 (2R) |
2015-12-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2015-12-17 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (48-18-2) |
2015-12-10 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2015-06-29 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulatory Oversight Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4616 (Carry Over) 2016-01-19 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
A4616 (Carry Over) 2016-01-19 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
S2958 (Same As) 2016-01-11 - Substituted by A4616 (1R)
A4616 (Carry Over) 2016-01-19 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
S2958 (Same As) 2016-01-11 - Substituted by A4616 (1R)