NJ A4701 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1813
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Vetoed on July 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-13 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-13 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires State's full participation in Regional Greenhouse Gas Initiative.
Title
Requires State's full participation in Regional Greenhouse Gas Initiative.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S3059 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 26 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 26 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-13 | Assembly | Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (23-15) |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Substituted for S3059 |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2017-05-22 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (47-26-2) |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-03-20 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4701 (Carry Over) 2017-07-13 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly
S3059 (Same As) 2017-05-25 - Substituted by A4701
S3059 (Same As) 2017-05-25 - Substituted by A4701