NJ A4939 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1885
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-18 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-18 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DOH to develop interconception care resources to enhance postpartum care for women.
Title
Requires DOH to develop interconception care resources to enhance postpartum care for women.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-01-24 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2019-01-24 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee |
2019-01-17 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4939 (Carry Over) 2019-03-18 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S3372 (Same As) 2019-03-04 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S3372 (Same As) 2019-03-04 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee