NJ A4959 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-18 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-18 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides tax credit eligibility for qualified businesses at certain airports under Grow New Jersey Assistance Program.
Title
Provides tax credit eligibility for qualified businesses at certain airports under Grow New Jersey Assistance Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-12-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2017-12-14 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2017-06-08 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3169 (Same As) 2018-01-05 - Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading