NJ A5013 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S3194
Note: Carry Over of previous A3767
Note: Carry Over of previous A3767
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on November 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-22 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-22 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs Secretary of State to develop national marketing campaign promoting State's innovation economy.
Title
Directs Secretary of State to develop national marketing campaign promoting State's innovation economy.
Sponsors
Sen. Andrew Zwicker [D] | Rep. Linda Carter [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] | Rep. Vincent Mazzeo [D] |
Rep. Anthony Verrelli [D] | Sen. Gordon Johnson [D] | Rep. Christopher DePhillips [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-22 - Assembly - Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-11-19 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2062 (Same As) 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
S3194 (Carry Over) 2018-12-17 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A3767 (Carry Over) 2018-12-17 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
S3194 (Carry Over) 2018-12-17 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A3767 (Carry Over) 2018-12-17 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading