NJ A5091 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on January 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Approved P.L.2019, c.340.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on January 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Approved P.L.2019, c.340.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes "Safeguarding Against Financial Exploitation Act." *
Title
Establishes "Safeguarding Against Financial Exploitation Act." *
Sponsors
Sen. John McKeon [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] | Rep. Nancy Pinkin [D] | Sen. Nellie Pou [D] |
Sen. Troy Singleton [D] | Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] | Rep. Yvonne Lopez [D] | Sen. Gerald Cardinale [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-12-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S4259 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | Approved P.L.2019, c.340. |
2019-12-16 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0) |
2019-12-16 | Senate | Substituted for S4259 |
2019-12-16 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2019-12-16 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (77-0-0) |
2019-11-25 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Vainieri Huttle) |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S4259 (Same As) 2019-12-16 - Substituted by A5091 (2R)