NJ A5185 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-27 - Substituted by S3599
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-27 - Substituted by S3599
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revises neighborhood revitalization tax credit program to increase permitted annual tax credit allocation to $15 million.
Title
Revises neighborhood revitalization tax credit program to increase permitted annual tax credit allocation to $15 million.
Sponsors
Rep. Benjie Wimberly [D] | Rep. Mila Jasey [D] | Rep. Shanique Speight [D] | Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] |
Rep. William Spearman [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-27 | Assembly | Substituted by S3599 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Budget Committee |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2019-03-11 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3599 (Same As) 2019-06-30 - Approved P.L.2019, c.144.