NJ A5449 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on May 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-16 - Substituted by S2389 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-16 - Substituted by S2389 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires New Jersey State Board of Pharmacy to establish prescription drug pricing disclosure website and certain pharmaceutical manufacturing companies to provide prescription drug price information.
Title
Requires New Jersey State Board of Pharmacy to establish prescription drug pricing disclosure website and certain pharmaceutical manufacturing companies to provide prescription drug price information.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-12-05 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-16 | Assembly | Substituted by S2389 (1R) |
2019-12-05 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2389 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.404.