NJ A5627 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2653
Note: Carry Over of previous A2640
Note: Carry Over of previous S541
Note: Carry Over of previous A2640
Note: Carry Over of previous S541
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on May 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-12 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee
Pending: Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-12 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee
Pending: Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits municipal ordinance to create sanctuary city; establishes State and local employee ethics violation upon noncompliance with federal immigration enforcement request.
Title
Prohibits municipal ordinance to create sanctuary city; establishes State and local employee ethics violation upon noncompliance with federal immigration enforcement request.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-12 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5627 (Carry Over) 2021-05-12 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee
S431 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A2640 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Oversight, Reform and Federal Relations Committee
S541 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
S431 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A2640 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Oversight, Reform and Federal Relations Committee
S541 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A5627 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A9999/5627_I1.HTM |